Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Konrad Cardinal Krajewski

Prefect of the Dicastery for the Service of Charity

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Immacolata all’Esquilino


Motto: Misericordia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1963 Born
11 Jun 198824.5Ordained PriestPriest of Łódź, Poland
3 Aug 201349.6AppointedAlmoner of the Office of Papal Charities
3 Aug 201349.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Beneventum
17 Sep 201349.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Beneventum
28 Jun 201854.5Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 201854.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Immacolata all’Esquilino
24 Oct 201854.9InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Immacolata all’Esquilino
19 Mar 202258.3SelectedPrefect of the Dicastery for the Service of Charity
5 Jun 202258.5AppointedPrefect of the Dicastery for the Service of Charity

MicroData Summary
Konrad Krajewski
Konrad Cardinal Krajewski
(born )
Prefect of Service of Charity

EventPlace
Birth PlaceŁódź, Diocese of Łódź, Poland
Ordained PriestSt. Stanislaus Kostka, Cathedral Basilica, Łódź, Diocese of Łódź, Poland
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Cardinal through the Dicastery for the Service of Charity.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Aug 2013
  • ob: CB, 20 Aug 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,874
  • card: Bollettino, 20 May 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2018
  • i: Bollettino, 19 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025