Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Tiama

Bishop of Mopti, Mali


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1955² Born
7 Jan 198429.0Ordained PriestPriest
5 Nov 199843.8AppointedBishop of Sikasso, Mali
13 Feb 199944.1Ordained BishopBishop of Sikasso, Mali
27 Mar 202065.2AppointedBishop of Mopti, Mali

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Tiama
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Tiama (born 1955) Bishop of Mopti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNazar, Prefecture Apostolic of Gao
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame de Lourdes, Cathedral, Sikasso, Diocese of Sikasso

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mopti.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,479
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 27 Mar 2020

Quantcast