Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jonas Dembélé

Bishop of Kayes, Mali


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1963 Born
21 Jul 199128.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of San, Mali
12 Jul 199229.1Ordained PriestPriest of San, Mali
31 Jan 201349.7AppointedBishop of Kayes, Mali
11 May 201349.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kayes, Mali

MicroData Summary for Jonas Dembélé
Bishop Jonas Dembélé (born ) Bishop of Kayes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSokoura

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kayes.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Jan 2013
  • ob: CB, 13 Apr 2013
  • c2+: CB, 9 May 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,786

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast