Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lewis J. Zeigler

Archbishop of Monrovia, Liberia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1944 Born
22 Dec 197430.9Ordained PriestPriest of Monrovia, Liberia
17 Nov 198642.8IncardinatedPriest of Gbarnga, Liberia
30 May 200258.4AppointedBishop of Gbarnga, Liberia
9 Nov 200258.8Ordained BishopBishop of Gbarnga, Liberia
11 Jul 200965.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Monrovia, Liberia
12 Feb 201167.1SucceededArchbishop of Monrovia, Liberia

MicroData Summary for Lewis J. Zeigler
Archbishop Lewis J. Zeigler (born ) Archbishop of Monrovia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHarrisburg, Vicariate Apostolic of Liberia
Ordained BishopHoly Spirit, Cathedral, Gbarnga, Diocese of Gbarnga

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Monrovia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2009
  • s: Bollettino, 12 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,279

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 12 Jun 2018

Quantcast