Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Monrovia

Archidioecesis Monroviensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Lewis Zeigler, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 19 December 1981
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Liberia
  • Square Kilometers: 15,971 (6,168 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 2078, 1000 Monrovia 10, Liberia
  • Telephone: 227-245
  • Fax: 226-175

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Liberia
18 April 1903ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Sierra Leone Prefecture Apostolic of Liberia (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Liberia
9 April 1934ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Liberia Vicariate Apostolic of Liberia
2 February 1950Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Liberia Prefecture Apostolic of Cape Palmas (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Monrovia
2 February 1950Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Liberia Vicariate Apostolic of Monrovia
Archdiocese of Monrovia
19 December 1981ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Monrovia Archdiocese of Monrovia
17 November 1986Territory LostArchdiocese of Monrovia Diocese of Gbarnga (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Monrovia
19509,2712,000,000.5%262635697ap1951
197011,8201,000,0001.2%2624502364346ap1971
198027,0001,272,1192.1%430347943546424ap1981
Archdiocese of Monrovia
199060,0001,122,0005.3%1229411,4632356419ap1991
199995,0001,195,0007.9%1713303,1663232325ap2000
2000107,0001,400,0007.6%2014343,1473273125ap2001
2001115,0001,500,0007.7%1919383,0263323125ap2002
2002121,6001,550,0007.8%199284,3422222725ap2003
2003130,0001,630,0008.0%2610363,611192725ap2004
2004134,3241,630,0008.2%2511363,731212729ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 20 May 2013