Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Fallah Borwah

Bishop of Gbarnga, Liberia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1966 Born
15 Sep 199629.9Ordained PriestPriest of Monrovia, Liberia
21 Mar 201144.4AppointedBishop of Gbarnga, Liberia
11 Jun 201144.6Ordained BishopBishop of Gbarnga, Liberia

MicroData Summary for Anthony Fallah Borwah
Bishop Anthony Fallah Borwah (born ) Bishop of Gbarnga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWodu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gbarnga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 13 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,076

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast