Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael Kpakala Francis

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Monrovia, Liberia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1936Born
4 Aug 196327.4Ordained PriestPriest of Monrovia, Liberia
28 Oct 197640.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Monrovia, Liberia
28 Oct 197640.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Ausuccura
19 Dec 197640.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ausuccura
19 Dec 198145.8AppointedArchbishop of Monrovia, Liberia
12 Feb 201175.0RetiredArchbishop of Monrovia, Liberia
19 May 201377.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Monrovia, Liberia

MicroData Summary for Michael Kpakala Francis
Archbishop Michael Kpakala Francis (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Monrovia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKakata

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 36.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Feb 2011
  • d: CB, 19 May 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast