Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Cape Palmas

Dioecesis Capitis Palmensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Andrew Jagaye Karnley, Bishop
  • Boniface Nyema Dalieh, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 19 December 1981
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Monrovia
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Liberia
  • Square Kilometers: 31,760 (12,267 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, P.O. Box 11, Harper [Cape Palmas], Liberia; c/o Mission Catholique, B.P. 354, San Pedro, Cote d'Ivoire
  • Telephone: 47.16.232

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Cape Palmas
2 February 1950ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Liberia Prefecture Apostolic of Cape Palmas (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Cape Palmas
7 May 1962ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Cape Palmas Vicariate Apostolic of Cape Palmas
Diocese of Cape Palmas
19 December 1981ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Cape Palmas Diocese of Cape Palmas

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Cape Palmas
19708,875350,0002.5%16218493214ap1971
19807,290260,0002.8%291166292323ap1981
Diocese of Cape Palmas
199010,504307,0003.4%10313808182429ap1991
19919,700327,0003.0%12315646191129ap2000
200014,950250,0006.0%5272,1352712ap2001
200116,200250,0006.5%6282,0252712ap2002
200216,375250,0006.5%6282,0462812ap2003
200317,595250,0007.0%85131,3535119ap2004
200417,595250,0007.0%85131,3535119ap2005
200619,100271,0007.0%8192,12211810ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011