Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Henry Ganda

Archbishop Emeritus of Freetown and Bo, Sierra Leone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1932 Born
9 Apr 196129.0Ordained PriestPriest of Freetown and Bo, Sierra Leone
11 Nov 197038.6AppointedBishop of Kenema, Sierra Leone
21 Feb 197138.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kenema, Sierra Leone
4 Sep 198048.4AppointedArchbishop of Freetown and Bo, Sierra Leone
22 Mar 200775.0RetiredArchbishop of Freetown and Bo, Sierra Leone

MicroData Summary for Joseph Henry Ganda
Archbishop Joseph Henry Ganda (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Freetown and Bo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSerabu

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Freetown and Bo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Mar 2007

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 12 Jun 2018

Quantcast