Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Andrzej Załuski

Deceased

Bishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1702Born
1725¹22.9Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jan 175956.9SelectedBishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine
24 Sep 175957.6ConfirmedBishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine
4 Nov 175957.8Ordained BishopBishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine
7 Jan 177471.9DiedBishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Józef Andrzej Załuski (VIAF: 32033881)
Bishop Józef Andrzej Załuski (born , died ) Bishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJedlińsk

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 248
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast