Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignacy Augustyn Kozierowski, C.R.L.A. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno

Titular Bishop of Adraa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1706³BornStanovicen
28 Dec 173125.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Canons Regular of the Lateran Congregation of Austria
18 May 173225.5Ordained PriestPriest of Canons Regular of the Lateran Congregation of Austria
22 Nov 176256.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
22 Nov 176256.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Adraa
26 Jan 179184.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Ignacy Augustyn Kozierowski:
Bishop Ignacy Augustyn Kozierowski C.R.L.A. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno

  • a priest for 58.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 65, and Page 454

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 19 Sep 2013