Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrzej Ignacy Bajer (Baier)

Deceased

Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1712BornPytzinki
17 Oct 175846.7SelectedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
12 Feb 175947.0ConfirmedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
1 Apr 175947.2Ordained BishopBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
31 Jan 178573.0DiedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Ignacy Bajer (Baier):
Bishop Andrzej Ignacy Bajer (Baier) (born , died ) Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 188
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,880
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1773
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015