Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mikołaj Dembowski

Deceased

Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1693³BornLangien
11 Dec 172935.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 Dec 172936.0Ordained PriestPriest
13 Sep 174147.7SelectedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
9 Jul 174248.5ConfirmedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
7 Oct 174248.8Ordained BishopBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
27 Nov 175763.9DiedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mikołaj Dembowski:
Bishop Mikołaj Dembowski (born , died ) Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec)

  • a priest for 27.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 142, and Page 259
  • ob/obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1742, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015