Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antoni Kazimierz Ostrowski

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1713³BornOstrów
10 Jun 173623.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
Jul 1736²23.2Ordained PriestPriest
9 Dec 175239.6SelectedBishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland
9 Apr 175340.0ConfirmedBishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland
2 Jun 175340.1Ordained BishopBishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland
2 Oct 175845.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
17 Sep 176350.4SucceededBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
19 Apr 177764.0SelectedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
23 Jun 177764.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
26 Aug 178471.4DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoni Kazimierz Ostrowski:
Archbishop Antoni Kazimierz Ostrowski (born , died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 226, and Page 435
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 445
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,863
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1753, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Dec 2015