Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Dembowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

Titular Bishop of Lambaesis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1701³BornPłock
24 Sep 175958.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
24 Sep 175958.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Lambaesis
2 Feb 176059.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lambaesis
14 Jul 178887.5ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
1790¹88.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Dembowski
Bishop Jan Dembowski (born , died 1790) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 250, and Page 454
  • bd: CB, 28 Jan 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,047
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1760, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016