Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Konstanty Moszyński, O.S.P.P.E. †

Deceased

Bishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1670³Born
5 Jun 169424.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Paul the First Hermit
22 Jun 173363.4AppointedBishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland
15 Aug 173363.5Ordained BishopBishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland
9 Sep 173868.6DiedBishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Konstanty Moszyński
Bishop Konstanty Moszyński O.S.P.P.E. (born , died ) Bishop of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChelmno
Ordained BishopAll Saints, Church, Varsovie

  • a priest for 44.2 years
  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,869
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 435
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1733, Number 20
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 56, Number 4,090

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast