Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Michał Ignacy Franciszek Olędzki, Sch. P. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow)

Titular Bishop of Cambysopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1733BornSwiczen
31 Jul 175723.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of the Pious Schools
10 Aug 175723.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Pious Schools
24 Jan 176329.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine
24 Jan 176329.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cambysopolis
27 Feb 176329.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cambysopolis
2 Mar 178147.4ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine
1803²69.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Józef Michał Ignacy Franciszek Olędzki:
Bishop Józef Michał Ignacy Franciszek Olędzki Sch. P. (born , died 1803) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow)

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 39.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 142, and Page 454
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,885
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1763, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 7 Dec 2015