Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam Stanisław Krasiński

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1714BornKraków
11 Aug 175945.3SelectedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
24 Sep 175945.4ConfirmedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
27 Jan 176045.8Ordained BishopBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
16 Oct 179884.5ResignedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
Oct 180086.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Adam Stanisław Krasiński:
Bishop Adam Stanisław Krasiński (born , died Oct 1800) Bishop Emeritus of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec)

  • a bishop for 40.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 143
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,649
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1760, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015