Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cesare Zacchi

Deceased

President Emeritus of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy

Titular Archbishop of Maura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1914BornArezzo, Italy
17 Oct 193722.9Ordained PriestPriest
16 Sep 196752.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Zella
16 Sep 196752.8AppointedOfficial to Cuba
12 Dec 196753.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zella
24 May 197459.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Maura
24 May 197459.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Cuba
1 Jun 197560.5AppointedPresident of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy, Roman Curia
8 Jun 198570.5ResignedPresident of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy, Roman Curia
24 Aug 199176.7DiedPresident Emeritus of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy, Roman Curia

MicroData Summary for Cesare Zacchi:
Archbishop Cesare Zacchi (born , died ) President Emeritus of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013