Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Tiendrebeogo (Kiedrebeogo)

Deceased

Bishop of Kaya, Burkina Faso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1941Born
27 Jun 197029.3Ordained PriestPriest of Ouagadougou, Burkina Faso
5 Nov 198140.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ouagadougou, Burkina Faso
5 Nov 198140.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thucca in Numidia
23 Jan 198240.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thucca in Numidia
30 Mar 199655.1AppointedBishop of Kaya, Burkina Faso
14 May 199857.2DiedBishop of Kaya, Burkina Faso

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Tiendrebeogo (Kiedrebeogo)
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Tiendrebeogo (Kiedrebeogo) (born , died ) Bishop of Kaya

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOuagadougou

  • a priest for 27.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast