Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kyrillos Kamal William Samaan

Bishop of Assiut {Lycopolis} (Coptic), Egypt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1946 Born
10 Jun 197427.6Ordained PriestPriest of Assiut {Lycopolis} (Coptic), Egypt
16 May 199043.6AppointedBishop of Assiut {Lycopolis} (Coptic), Egypt
3 Jun 199043.6Ordained BishopBishop of Assiut {Lycopolis} (Coptic), Egypt

MicroData Summary for Kyrillos Kamal William Samaan
Bishop Kyrillos Kamal William Samaan (born ) Bishop of Assiut {Lycopolis}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShanaynah, Eparchy of Assiut {Lycopolis} (Coptic)
Ordained Bishopla Mère de l'Amour Divin, Cathedral, Assiut, Eparchy of Assiut {Lycopolis} (Coptic)

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Assiut {Lycopolis} (Coptic).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,428
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 9 Oct 2019

Quantcast