Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Beshara (Bechara) Goda (Guida Matarana), O.F.M.

Bishop of Abu Qurqas (Coptic), Egypt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1971 Born
1 Sep 199625.0First VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
23 Mar 200129.5Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
8 Jun 200129.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
7 Jan 202048.3ConfirmedBishop of Abu Qurqas (Coptic), Egypt
27 Feb 202048.4Ordained BishopBishop of Abu Qurqas (Coptic), Egypt

MicroData Summary for Beshara (Bechara) Goda (Guida Matarana)
Bishop Beshara (Bechara) Goda (Guida Matarana) O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Abu Qurqas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAl-Nagila, Eparchy of Luqsor {Tebe} (Coptic)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Abu Qurqas, Eparchy of Abu Qurqas (Coptic)

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Abu Qurqas (Coptic).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Jan 2020
  • mn/bpd/c1/ob: CB, 9 Jan 2020
  • c2+: CB, 27 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 18 Sep 2020

Quantcast