Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonios Aziz Mina

Bishop of Guizeh (Coptic)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1955 BornMinya, Egypt
9 Jun 197823.3Ordained PriestPriest of Minya {Ermopoli Maggiore; Minieh} (Coptic), Egypt
19 Dec 200247.8SelectedCurial Bishop of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt
21 Dec 200247.8ConfirmedCurial Bishop of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt
21 Dec 200247.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Mareotes
13 Feb 200348.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mareotes
27 Dec 200550.8SelectedBishop of Guizeh (Coptic), Egypt
3 Jan 200650.9ConfirmedBishop of Guizeh (Coptic), Egypt
22 Jan 200650.9InstalledBishop of Guizeh (Coptic), Egypt

MicroData Summary for Antonios Aziz Mina:
Bishop Antonios Aziz Mina (born ) Bishop of Guizeh

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Guizeh (Coptic).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jan 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,328
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015