Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Athanasios Abadir

Deceased

Bishop of Ismayliah (Coptic), Egypt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1922Born
8 Jul 195027.8Ordained PriestPriest
18 May 197653.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Appia
18 May 197653.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt
26 Sep 197654.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Appia
17 Dec 198260.3AppointedBishop of Ismayliah (Coptic), Egypt
25 May 199269.7DiedBishop of Ismayliah (Coptic), Egypt

MicroData Summary for Athanasios Abadir
Bishop Athanasios Abadir (born , died ) Bishop of Ismayliah

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQussiah

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 25 May 2018

Quantcast