Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonios Cardinal Naguib

Patriarch Emeritus of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1935 BornMinya
30 Oct 196025.6Ordained PriestPriest of Minya {Ermopoli Maggiore; Minieh} (Coptic), Egypt
26 Jul 197742.4AppointedBishop of Minya {Ermopoli Maggiore; Minieh} (Coptic), Egypt
9 Sep 197742.5Ordained BishopBishop of Minya {Ermopoli Maggiore; Minieh} (Coptic), Egypt
29 Sep 200267.6ResignedBishop of Minya {Ermopoli Maggiore; Minieh} (Coptic), Egypt
30 Mar 200671.1AppointedPatriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt
30 Mar 200671.1AppointedBishop of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt
20 Nov 201075.7Elevated to Cardinal
13 Jan 201377.8RetiredPatriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt
13 Jan 201377.8RetiredBishop of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt

MicroData Summary for Antonios Naguib:
Antonios Cardinal Naguib (born ) Patriarch Emeritus of Alexandria {Alessandria}

Please contact the Cardinal through the Patriarchate of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Apr 2006
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Jan 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 12 Aug 2014