Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andraos Salama

Deceased

Bishop of Guizeh (Coptic)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1931BornLe Caire
22 Dec 195625.1Ordained PriestPriest
1 Nov 198857.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt
1 Nov 198857.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Barca
5 Feb 198957.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Barca
21 Mar 200371.4AppointedBishop of Guizeh (Coptic), Egypt
6 Dec 200574.1DiedBishop of Guizeh (Coptic), Egypt

MicroData Summary for Andraos Salama:
Bishop Andraos Salama (born , died ) Bishop of Guizeh

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,453
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013