Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kamal Fahim Awad (Boutros) Hanna

Bishop of Minya {Ermopoli Maggiore; Minieh} (Coptic)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1961 BornTwa
20 May 198826.8Ordained PriestPriest of Minya {Ermopoli Maggiore; Minieh} (Coptic), Egypt
31 Aug 200645.0SelectedCurial Bishop of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt
6 Sep 200645.0ConfirmedCurial Bishop of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt
6 Sep 200645.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Mareotes
13 Oct 200645.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mareotes
25 Mar 201351.6SelectedBishop of Minya {Ermopoli Maggiore; Minieh} (Coptic), Egypt
8 Apr 201351.6ConfirmedBishop of Minya {Ermopoli Maggiore; Minieh} (Coptic), Egypt

MicroData Summary for Kamal Fahim Awad (Boutros) Hanna:
Bishop Kamal Fahim Awad (Boutros) Hanna (born ) Bishop of Minya {Ermopoli Maggiore; Minieh}

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Minya {Ermopoli Maggiore; Minieh} (Coptic).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Sep 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,273
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Apr 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015