Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Brunner

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Middlesbrough, England

Titular Bishop of Murustaga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1889BornHull, Yorkshire
9 Apr 191727.6Ordained PriestPriest of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain
22 Jun 194656.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain
22 Jun 194656.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Elis
25 Jul 194656.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elis
4 Apr 195666.6AppointedBishop of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain
13 Jun 196777.8RetiredBishop of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain
13 Jun 196777.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Murustaga
21 Mar 196979.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for George Brunner:
Bishop George Brunner (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Middlesbrough

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013