Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joannes Walter Panis, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Manado, Indonesia

Titular Bishop of Trisipa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1882Born
21 Dec 190927.3Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
12 Jun 192340.8AppointedPrefect of Celebes, Indonesia
1 Feb 193451.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Trisipa
1 Feb 193451.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Celebes, Indonesia
24 Jun 193451.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Trisipa
Mar 1947³64.5ResignedVicar Apostolic of Manado, Indonesia
23 Jun 195269.9DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Manado, Indonesia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joannes Walter Panis
Bishop Joannes Walter Panis M.S.C. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Manado

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKlein-Dongen

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1934, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast