Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Basankusu

Dioecesis Basankusuensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Joseph Mokobe Ndjoku, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 10 November 1959
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Mbandaka-Bikoro
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Congo, The Democratic Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 77,000 (29,741 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: B.P. 68, Basankusu; Eveche de Basankusu, c/o Procure des Missions Sainte Anne, B.P. 1800, Kinshasa 1, Rep. Democratique du Congo
  • Telephone: (099)229.13.90

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Basankusu
28 July 1926ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Nouvelle-Anvers Prefecture Apostolic of Basankusu (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Basankusu
8 January 1948ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Basankusu Vicariate Apostolic of Basankusu
14 June 1951Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Basankusu
Vicariate Apostolic of Lisala
Vicariate Apostolic of Stanley-ville
Prefecture Apostolic of Isangi (erected)
Diocese of Basankusu
10 November 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Basankusu Diocese of Basankusu

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Basankusu
195036,872200,00018.4%424287745ap1951
Diocese of Basankusu
195747,623205,00023.2%153548816118ap1960
197069,183220,00031.4%542471,4715023ap1971
198091,600267,00034.3%531362,5443733ap1981
1990280,609568,00049.4%1324377,584393220ap1991
1998170,485420,00040.6%378453,788142920ap2003
2003182,846459,04639.8%273306,094103020ap2004
2004202,273568,16235.6%323355,779103020ap2005
2006230,331584,00039.4%333366,398103120ap2007
2012228,000592,00038.5%292317,354134820ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 8 Sep 2013