Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Kieran O’Reilly, S.M.A.

Archbishop of Cashel and Emly


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1952 BornCork
10 Apr 197724.6Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Society of African Missions
17 Jun 197825.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
2001²48.3AppointedSuperior General of Society of African Missions
18 May 201057.7AppointedBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
29 Aug 201058.0Ordained BishopBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
22 Nov 201462.2AppointedArchbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
8 Feb 201562.5InstalledArchbishop of Cashel and Emly, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Kieran O’Reilly:
Archbishop Kieran O’Reilly S.M.A. (born ) Archbishop of Cashel and Emly

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cashel and Emly.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 May 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,776
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Nov 2014
  • d/name: Bollettino, 26 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 10 Feb 2015