Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Morris

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cashel (-Emly)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1914BornKilkennybeg, Killenaule
18 Jun 193924.7Ordained PriestPriest of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
21 Dec 195945.2AppointedArchbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
28 Feb 196045.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
12 Sep 198873.9ResignedArchbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
16 Jan 199782.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland

MicroData Summary for Thomas Morris:
Archbishop Thomas Morris (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cashel (-Emly)

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 36.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 29 Sep 2013