Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael Aidan Courtney

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Burundi

Titular Archbishop of Eanach Dúin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1945Born
9 Mar 196823.0Ordained PriestPriest
30 Dec 199550.9AppointedPermanent Observer to Council of Europe
18 Aug 200055.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Eanach Dúin
18 Aug 200055.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Burundi
12 Nov 200055.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Eanach Dúin
29 Dec 200358.8DiedApostolic Nuncio to Burundi

MicroData Summary for Michael Aidan Courtney
Archbishop Michael Aidan Courtney (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Burundi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNenagh, Ireland
Ordained BishopSaint Mary of the Rosary, Church, Nenagh, Ireland

  • a priest for 35.8 years
  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 161, Number 13,860
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast