Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Trân Văn Toàn

Bishop of Long Xuyên, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1955 Born
16 Jan 199236.7Ordained PriestPriest of Long Xuyên, Viet Nam
5 Apr 201458.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Long Xuyên, Viet Nam
5 Apr 201458.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Acalissus
29 May 201459.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acalissus
25 Aug 201762.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Long Xuyên, Viet Nam
23 Feb 201963.8SucceededBishop of Long Xuyên, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Joseph Trân Văn Toàn
Bishop Joseph Trân Văn Toàn (born ) Bishop of Long Xuyên

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThái B́nh
Ordained BishopOpen Air, near, Cathedral, Long Xuyên, Diocese of Long Xuyên

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Long Xuyên.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Apr 2014
  • c1: CB, 5 Apr 2014
  • ob: CB, 9 Apr 2014
  • c2+: CB, 29 May 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,172
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Aug 2017
  • s: Bollettino, 23 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.3, 16 Feb 2019; Data: 23 Feb 2019

Quantcast