Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques-Joseph-François de Vogüé

Deceased

Bishop of Dijon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1740BornAubenas
3 Mar 177635.9SelectedBishop of Dijon, France
20 May 177636.1ConfirmedBishop of Dijon, France
9 Jun 177636.2Ordained BishopBishop of Dijon, France
6 Feb 178746.8DiedBishop of Dijon, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Joseph-François de Vogüé:
Bishop Jacques-Joseph-François de Vogüé (born , died ) Bishop of Dijon

  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013