Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Marcel de Coëtlogon-Méjusseaume

Deceased

Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1648¹BornRennes, France
6 Sep 168032.6SelectedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
1 Sep 168133.6ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
14 Dec 168133.9Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
11 Apr 170557.2SelectedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
7 Sep 170557.6ResignedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
7 Sep 170557.6ConfirmedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
18 Apr 170759.2DiedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Louis-Marcel de Coëtlogon-Méjusseaume:
Bishop Louis-Marcel de Coëtlogon-Méjusseaume (born 1648, died ) Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}

  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 126, and Page 383
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1681, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 29 Apr 2015