Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre de Charrite de Ruthie

Deceased

Bishop of Rieux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1655¹BornAssurucq
24 Dec 170550.9SelectedBishop of Rieux, France
13 Sep 170651.6ConfirmedBishop of Rieux, France
31 Oct 170651.8Ordained BishopBishop of Rieux, France
7 Sep 171863.6DiedBishop of Rieux, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Charrite de Ruthie:
Bishop Pierre de Charrite de Ruthie (born 1655, died ) Bishop of Rieux

  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 334
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1706, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 20 Jun 2015