Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Londrina

Archidioecesis Londrinensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Orlando Brandes, Archbishop
  • Albano Bortoletto Cavallin, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 31 October 1970
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Parana
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 6,594 (2,546 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sul II
  • Web Site: http://www.arquidiocesedelondrina.com.br/
  • Mailing Address: C.P. 872, Travessa Pe. Eugenio Herter 33, 86001-970 Londrina, PR, Brazil
  • Telephone: (043) 322-1960
  • Fax: 322-1998

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Londrina
1 February 1956ErectedDiocese of Jacarezinho Diocese of Londrina (erected)
28 November 1964Territory LostDiocese of Campo Mourão
Diocese of Londrina
Diocese of Apucarana (erected)
Archdiocese of Londrina
31 October 1970ElevatedDiocese of Londrina Archdiocese of Londrina

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Londrina
1966391,650457,70085.6%1560755,2227526735ap1967
Archdiocese of Londrina
1970650,000.0%17708707526442ap1971
1976450,000504,27589.2%1366795,69616728843ap1977
1977510,000638,00079.9%1864826,2199321345ap1981
1990690,000814,00084.8%1862808,62529421754ap1991
1999740,400900,00082.3%37671047,119310217862ap2000
2000740,400900,00082.3%38721106,73039119363ap2001
2001658,800900,00073.2%38791175,630311018965ap2002
2002658,800900,00073.2%46801265,2282211517965ap2003
2003658,800900,00073.2%48871354,8802211524868ap2004
2004658,800900,00073.2%49881374,8082211319068ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.6, 8 Jan 2013; data: 3 Feb 2013