Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Claude Bouchard, O.M.I.

Bishop of Pala, Chad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1940 Born
30 Aug 196928.9Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
26 Feb 197736.4AppointedBishop of Pala, Chad
1 May 197736.6Ordained BishopBishop of Pala, Chad

MicroData Summary for Jean-Claude Bouchard
Bishop Jean-Claude Bouchard O.M.I. (born ) Bishop of Pala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Eloi, Canada

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pala.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast