Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josaphat Josyf Fedoryk, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1897BornJaroslav, Poland
14 Mar 192325.2ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
18 Apr 192628.3Solemn ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
1 Jan 192830.0Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
1964²66.0Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
28 Dec 197982.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Josaphat Josyf Fedoryk:
Bishop Josaphat Josyf Fedoryk O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów]

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,266
  • bp/prof/op: CB, 25 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 1 Mar 2015