Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vasyl Popovics

Deceased

Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1796Born
6 Apr 182023.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
10 Apr 182023.5Ordained PriestPriest of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
21 Mar 183740.5SelectedBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
2 Oct 183741.0ConfirmedBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
18 Mar 183841.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
19 Oct 186468.1DiedBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Vasyl Popovics (VIAF: 121514105)
Bishop Vasyl Popovics (born , died ) Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKomját
Ordained BishopLviv, Archeparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian)

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 273
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,591
  • odd/opd/c012: CB, 19 May 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1838, Number 9
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 38, Number 2,344

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast