Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Petro Bielański (Bilyanskyi)

Deceased

Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1736¹Born
30 Oct 177943.8AppointedBishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
23 Sep 178145.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
1793²57.0AppointedAdministrator of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
1796²60.0ResignedAdministrator of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
29 May 179862.4DiedBishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Petro Bielański (Bilyanskyi) (VIAF: 313475703)
Bishop Petro Bielański (Bilyanskyi) (born 1736, died ) Bishop of Lviv

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZhovkva, Cardinal Titular Titles

  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 270
  • b/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 181, Number 14,929
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1781, Number 20
  • c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,903
  • ab/name: CB, 11 Oct 2017
  • admi/d: CB, 12 Oct 2017
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast