Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gyula Firczák

Deceased

Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1836BornHorlyón
20 Sep 186125.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
26 Sep 186125.1Ordained PriestPriest
26 May 189154.8SelectedBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
17 Dec 189155.3ConfirmedBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
10 Apr 189255.6Ordained BishopBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
1 May 189255.7InstalledBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
1 Jun 1912³75.8DiedBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gyula Firczák:
Bishop Gyula Firczák (born , died ) Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács)

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 396

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013