Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Schirò, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Durrës (Durazzo) (Albanian), Albania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1690²Born
22 Mar 173646.2AppointedArchbishop of Durrës (Durazzo) (Albanian), Albania
15 Apr 173646.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Durrës (Durazzo) (Albanian), Albania
2 Dec 176979.9DiedArchbishop of Durrës (Durazzo) (Albanian), Albania

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Schirò
Archbishop Joseph Schirò O.S.B.M. (born 1690, died ) Archbishop of Durrës (Durazzo)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiana dei Greci

  • a bishop for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 203
  • bd/bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1736, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast