Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jason Junosza Smogorževsky

Deceased

Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1715Born
3 Jul 174025.1Ordained PriestPriest
5 Sep 175843.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
31 Dec 175843.6Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
18 Jul 176247.2SucceededArchbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
1779²63.6AppointedAdministrator of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
1780²64.6ResignedArchbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
30 Oct 178065.4SelectedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
25 Jun 178166.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
27 Sep 178873.3DiedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Jason Junosza Smogorževsky
Archbishop Jason Junosza Smogorževsky (born , died ) Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWolkowsco

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 249
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 255, and Page 284
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1758, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast