Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Basilio Matranga, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Achrida (Ochrida)

Note/Previous Titular See: (vica/Cimarra)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1677¹BornPiana dei Greci
Sep 1714²37.6AppointedVicar Apostolic
19 Aug 171538.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Dionysias
1719¹42.0ResignedVicar Apostolic
7 Oct 172649.7AppointedArchbishop of Achrida (Ochrida), Bulgaria
7 Apr 174871.2DiedArchbishop of Achrida (Ochrida), Bulgaria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Basilio Matranga:
Archbishop Basilio Matranga O.S.B.M. (born 1677, died ) Archbishop of Achrida (Ochrida)

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,864
  • b: CB, 12 Jul 2015
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1715, Number 34
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 68, and Page 186

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 27 Jul 2015