Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gyula Városy

Deceased

Archbishop of Kalocsa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1846BornZombor
24 Jul 187023.9Ordained PriestPriest of Kalocsa, Hungary
1 Nov 190155.2SelectedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
16 Dec 190155.3ConfirmedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
19 Jan 190255.4Ordained BishopBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
11 Dec 190559.3AppointedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
28 Oct 191064.2DiedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Gyula Városy:
Archbishop Gyula Városy (born , died ) Archbishop of Kalocsa

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 85
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013