Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ottokár Prohászka

Deceased

Bishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1858BornNitria, Slovakia
30 Oct 188123.1Ordained PriestPriest
17 Oct 190547.0SelectedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
11 Dec 190547.2ConfirmedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
21 Dec 190547.2Ordained BishopBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary
2 Apr 192768.5DiedBishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale), Hungary

MicroData Summary for Ottokár Prohászka:
Bishop Ottokár Prohászka (born , died ) Bishop of Székesfehérvár (Albareale)

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 43
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013