Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Janos Majorosy

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Knin (Tinin)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1831Born
20 Jul 185524.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Kalocsa, Hungary
22 Jul 185524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Kalocsa, Hungary
27 Jul 188554.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
27 Jul 188554.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
11 Oct 188554.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
26 Nov 190473.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Janos Majorosy
Bishop Janos Majorosy (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kalocsa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAl-Debrö
Ordained BishopKalocsa, Archdiocese of Kalocsa

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 555
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017