Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of San Marcos de Arica

Dioecesis Aricensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 12 October 2011
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Antofagasta
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Chile
  • Square Kilometers: 16,521 (6,381 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.obispadoarica.cl/
  • Mailing Address: Calle 21 de Mayo 912, Casilla 147, San Marcos 260, Arica, Chile
  • Telephone: (058)251.393
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Arica
17 February 1959ErectedDiocese of Iquique Territorial Prelature of Arica (erected)
Diocese of Arica
29 August 1986ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Arica Diocese of Arica
Diocese of San Marcos de Arica
12 October 2011Name ChangedDiocese of Arica Diocese of San Marcos de Arica

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Arica
196572,00077,00093.5%313164,50015259ap1967
196890,000100,00090.0%214165,62514266ap1971
1976120,000145,00082.8%59148,571591919ap1977
1980110,600134,00082.5%712195,8217122521ap1981
Diocese of Arica
1990139,600174,00080.2%1110216,6477102427ap1991
1999145,977197,00074.1%166226,635861922ap2000
2000146,000194,75175.0%146207,300861922ap2001
2001148,000196,84875.2%157226,727672322ap2002
2002149,378197,85675.5%177246,224772123ap2003
200396,460185,26852.1%177244,0191282123ap2004
2004147,490194,64075.8%166226,7041272123ap2005
2006130,700185,32070.5%168245,4451282222ap2007
2010136,000193,00070.5%233265,2301232122ap2011
Diocese of San Marcos de Arica

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 14 May 2013